US HB3406 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-23)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Second Chance Reauthorization Act of 2015 This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to: revise and reauthorize grant programs for offender reentry demonstration projects; family-based substance abuse treatment; and evaluating and improving educational methods at prisons, jails, and juvenile facilities; and repeal grant programs for offender reentry courts and drug treatment alternatives to incarceration. Additionally, the legislation amends the Second Chance Act of 2007 to: rename, revise, and reauthorize grant programs for technology career training demonstration projects and reentry mentoring services, reauthorize offender reentry research and the grant program for offender reentry substance abuse and criminal justice collaboration, reauthorize and modify eligibility for an elderly offender early release pilot program, and repeal grant programs for the responsible reintegration of offenders and the study of Depot Naltrexone to treat heroin addiction. It amends the federal criminal code establish partnerships between prisons and faith- or community-based nonprofit organizations to conduct activities to reduce recidivism. The Department of Justice (DOJ) Office of Inspector General must conduct annual audits of selected grant recipients to prevent waste, fraud, and abuse of funds. The bill prohibits grants to nonprofit organizations that hold money in an offshore account to avoid tax liability. It also prohibits a grantee from using grant funds to lobby DOJ or a state, local, or tribal government regarding the award of grant funding. DOJ, in collaboration with interested persons, providers, and organizations, and state, local, and tribal governments, must coordinate and report to Congress on federal reentry programs, policies, and practices. The bill limits the use of grants for conferences that use more than $20,000 in DOJ funds.
Title
Second Chance Reauthorization Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-01-08 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1513 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adult education and literacy
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Drug therapy
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Family services
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian social and development programs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Research administration and funding
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local courts
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vocational and technical education
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adult education and literacy
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Drug therapy
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Family services
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian social and development programs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Research administration and funding
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local courts
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3406/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3406/BILLS-114hr3406ih.pdf |