US HB3402 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-3)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve and to expand eligibility for dependency and indemnity compensation paid to certain survivors of certain veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Caring for Survivors Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB976 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3402/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3402/BILLS-117hr3402ih.pdf |