US HB3392 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Lake Bistineau Land Title Stability Act This bill declares that the document titled "Dependent Re-Survey, Extension Survey and Survey of Two Islands, Sections 17, 29, and 30" (published in the Federal Register on February 27, 1969) shall not be considered to be, or serve as, a gross error determination and shall have no legal force or effect on the ownership of certain land surrounding Lake Bistineau in northern Louisiana. The meander lines recorded in the original survey of such land approved by the Surveyor General on December 8, 1842, shall be definitive for purposes of determining title to such land and two adjacent islands. The Department of the Interior shall prepare a disclaimer of any U.S. right, title, or interest in and to any such land that is located outside such meander lines and any omitted land that was in place, but not included, in the original survey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake Bistineau Land Title Stability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-06-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-06-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5603)
2018-06-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3392.
2018-06-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5603-5604)
2018-06-25HouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-06-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 597.
2018-06-20HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-768.
2018-04-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-04-11HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-08-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-07-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-07-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1219 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback