US HB3375 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 171-66-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Stopping Bad Robocalls Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stopping Bad Robocalls Act

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]

Roll Calls

2019-07-24 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 502 (Y: 429 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-25SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-07-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 429 - 3 (Roll no. 502). (text: CR H7293-7296)
2019-07-24HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7312)
2019-07-24HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-07-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3375.
2019-07-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7292-7303)
2019-07-24HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-23HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
2019-07-23HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-173.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-25HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-06-25HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-06-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-06-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3434 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB3780 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB3325 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback