US HB3373 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To strengthen United States engagement in the Oceania region and enhance the security and resilience of allies and partners of the Oceania community, and for other purposes.
Title
Honoring OCEANIA Act Honoring Our Commitment to Elevate America’s Neighbor Islands and Allies Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Natural Resources, Armed Services, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1774 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3373/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3373/BILLS-117hr3373ih.pdf |