US HB336 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes assistance and weapons transfers to Israel, and extends defense cooperation with Jordan. It establishes additional sanctions related to the conflict in Syria, and allows states to divest from entities boycotting Israel. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2019 The bill reauthorizes through FY2028 Foreign Military Financing to Israel. It extends loan guarantees to Israel through FY2023, and authorizes the President to transfer precision-guided munitions to the country. The bill directs the President to report on steps taken to help Israel secure a strategic trade authorization exception. United States-Jordan Defense Cooperation Extension Act The bill extends through 2022 arrangements that allow certain defense articles to be transferred to Jordan on an expedited basis. The bill also directs the President to submit a report to Congress assessing the costs and benefits of establishing a fund to support private investment in Jordan. Caesar Syria Civilian Protection Act of 2019 The bill directs the Department of the Treasury to determine whether the Central Bank of Syria is a primary money-laundering concern and, if so, impose special measures on transactions involving the bank. The bill also imposes sanctions on individuals providing support for the Syrian government. Combating BDS Act of 2019 The bill allows a state or local government to adopt measures to divest its assets from entities using boycotts, divestments, or sanctions to influence Israel's policies. Such measures shall meet various requirements, including those related to written notice and comment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening America’s Security in the Middle East Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]
Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB31 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 107.
SB1 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - Held at the desk.
SB28 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4.
SB52 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.

Subjects

Arms control and nonproliferation
Aviation and airports
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Chemical and biological weapons
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Detention of persons
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Financial services and investments
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Israel
Jordan
Lebanon
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Oil and gas
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Russia
Sanctions
Space flight and exploration
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback