US HB3354 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-02 - Became Public Law No: 118-213.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-02 - Became Public Law No: 118-213.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 220 North Hatcher Avenue in Purcellville, Virginia, as the "Secretary of State Madeleine Albright Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 220 North Hatcher Avenue in Purcellville, Virginia, as the "Secretary of State Madeleine Albright Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] |
Rep. Jennifer McClellan [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 179 (Y: 371 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-02 | House | Became Public Law No: 118-213. |
2025-01-02 | House | Signed by President. |
2024-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7199) |
2024-09-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536. |
2024-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-05-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 28, 3 Present (Roll no. 179). (text: 5/6/2024 CR H2855) |
2024-05-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2889) |
2024-05-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-05-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3354. |
2024-05-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2855) |
2024-05-06 | House | Mr. LaTurner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-04-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 1. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2024-03-07 | House | Defeated Measure by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4737 (Same As) 2024-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.