US HB3320 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 146.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 146.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to restrict procurement of information technology, telecommunications equipment and services, and related products or services from a vendor that poses a risk to the DHS supply chain. A vendor poses a risk if a malicious actor may manipulate the design, integrity, manufacturing, production, distribution, installation, operation, or maintenance of a vendor's covered article.
Title
Securing the Homeland Security Supply Chain Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 146. |
2019-08-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-188. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-17 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism