US HB3318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to establish a task force to conduct an analysis of emerging and potential future threats to transportation security, including threats posed by the release of chemical or biological agents in aviation or surface transportation systems. The TSA must develop a threat mitigation strategy for each of the threats the task force examines in its analysis. The Government Accountability Office must conduct a review of the feasibility, risks, costs, and potential threat mitigation benefits of the TSA deploying its passenger and property screening assets to conduct screening in areas or facilities prior to passenger arrivals at airport terminals.
Title
Emerging Transportation Security Threats Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9371-9372) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3318. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9371-9373) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Slotkin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-08-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153. |
2019-08-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-195. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-17 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Worker safety and health
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Worker safety and health