US HB3311 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Reorganization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Reorganization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenatePresented to President.
2019-08-01SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-08-01SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5321)
2019-07-24SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-07-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7217-7219)
2019-07-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3311.
2019-07-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7217-7220)
2019-07-23HouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-23HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 131.
2019-07-23HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-171.
2019-07-11HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-07-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
2019-06-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-06-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1091 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback