US HB3309 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-245, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-245, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Middle Class Tax Relief and Job Creation Act of 2012 to establish a uniform fee schedule applicable to the processing of forms for the consideration of applications for the placement of communications facilities on certain buildings and other property owned by the Federal Government, and for other purposes.
Title
Standard FEES Act Standard Fees to Expedite Evaluation and Streamlining Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-245, Part I. |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3309/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3309/BILLS-118hr3309ih.pdf |