US HB3309 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 723.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Social Security Online Tools Innovation Act of 2018 This bill requires the Social Security Administration to make available, within two years, online tools that allow individuals who are eligible for disability benefits under the Social Security Act to assess the impact of earnings on their eligibility for federal and state benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Security Online Tools Innovation Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 723.
2018-09-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-932.
2018-07-18HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
2018-07-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6559 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback