US HB3299 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-12)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Public Health Emergency Response Act of 2016 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the program to enhance community and hospital preparedness for public health emergencies to use at least 97% of its funding for awards. The Government Accountability Office must report on programs for public health emergency preparedness. The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must ensure procedures are in place to coordinate the ongoing stockpiling of countermeasures (certain medical supplies) by the Biomedical Advanced Research and Development Authority (BARDA) and Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Procurement of countermeasures using the Biodefense Countermeasures appropriations account no longer requires Presidential approval or an agreement between HHS and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). BARDA is given direct contracting authority. The annual countermeasures plan developed by the Office of the Assistant Secretary for Preparedness and Response must report on the amount of time between a BARDA request and the award of a contract. This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to add diseases and other agents that are determined to be a material threat by DHS to the list of tropical diseases under the priority review voucher program, which awards a voucher to the sponsor of a new drug or biological product that is approved to prevent or treat a listed disease. (A voucher entitles the holder to have a future new drug or biological product application acted upon by the Food and Drug Administration within six months.)
Title
Strengthening Public Health Emergency Response Act of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 571. |
2016-09-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-735. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 15. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-08 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-06-08 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-07 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development