US HB3294 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 201-19)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the long-term improvement of Historically Black Colleges and Universities, and for other purposes.
Title
IGNITE HBCU Excellence Act Institutional Grants for New Infrastructure, Technology, and Education for HBCU Excellence Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1945 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6893 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8803 (Related) 2022-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB6893 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8803 (Related) 2022-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3294/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3294/BILLS-117hr3294ih.pdf |