US HB3293 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-77, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-77, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Safe Drinking Water Act and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to establish programs to assist low-income households in maintaining access to drinking water and wastewater services, and for other purposes.
Title
Low-Income Water Customer Assistance Programs Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-77, Part I. |
2021-06-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 24. |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2021-06-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3293/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3293/BILLS-117hr3293ih.pdf |