US HB3292 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies an agreement relating to the settlement of the Aamodt litigation, which resolved claims concerning Pueblo water resources. The bill also reauthorizes through FY2028 activities to construct a regional water system as part of the settlement. Specifically, the bill ratifies an agreement between the United States, New Mexico, the city of Santa Fe, and the Pueblos of Nambe, Pojoaque, San Ildefonso, and Tesuque relating to the litigation. (This agreement is in addition to previously ratified agreements settling the litigation.)
Title
Aamodt Litigation Settlement Completion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1875 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
SB886 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
SB886 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
New Mexico
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
New Mexico
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3292/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3292/BILLS-116hr3292ih.pdf |