US HB3289 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019 This bill addresses Hong Kong's status under U.S. law and imposes sanctions on those responsible for human rights violations in Hong Kong. (Hong Kong is part of China but has a largely separate legal and economic system.) The Department of State shall certify annually to Congress as to whether Hong Kong warrants its unique treatment under various treaties, agreements, and U.S. law. The analysis shall evaluate whether Hong Kong is upholding the rule of law and protecting rights enumerated in various documents, including (1) the agreement between the United Kingdom and China regarding Hong Kong's return to China, and (2) the Universal Declaration of Human Rights. The bill extends existing annual reporting requirements on matters of U.S. interest in Hong Kong through 2027 and expands such reports to include assessments of (1) limits to Hong Kong's autonomy, either self-imposed or due to China's actions; and (2) whether rescission of Hong Kong's special treatment would further erode Hong Kong's autonomy. The President shall annually report to Congress on Hong Kong's enforcement of U.S. export controls, including whether items of U.S. origin have been used for mass surveillance in China and whether Hong Kong has been used to evade sanctions on North Korea or Iran. The State Department shall notify Congress if any proposed or enacted law in Hong Kong negatively impacts U.S. interests, including by putting U.S. citizens at risk of rendition to China. The President shall impose property and visa-blocking sanctions on foreign persons responsible for gross human rights violations in Hong Kong.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
2019-10-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8119-8122)
2019-10-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3289.
2019-10-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8119-8124)
2019-10-15HouseMr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-09-25HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
2019-09-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1838 (Same As) 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-76. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback