US HB3286 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HIRE Vets Act Honoring Investments in Recruiting and Employing American Military Veterans Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Labor to establish a HIRE Vets Medallion Program to solicit voluntary information from employers for purposes of recognizing, by the award of a HIRE Vets Medallion, verified efforts by these employers to: (1) recruit, employ, and retain veterans; and (2) provide community and charitable services supporting the veteran community. Labor shall annually: (1) solicit voluntary medallion applications from employers, and (2) review applications and present the President with a list of recipients. The President shall annually present the medallion and corresponding certificate to recipients at a time to coincide with the annual commemoration of Veterans Day. Labor shall begin soliciting applications by January 31, stop accepting applications not earlier than April 30, and finish application review by August 31. The President shall notify chosen applicants no later than October 11. Medallions shall be awarded in November. (Sec. 3) Labor shall establish two levels of medallions for large and small employers, to be designated the Gold HIRE Vets Medallion and the Platinum HIRE Vets Medallion. The bill prescribes awards criteria. (Sec. 4) A recipient: (1) may publicly display the medallion and certificate through the end of the calendar year, and (2) may not publicly display the award as part of any advertisement implying receipt of the award for any calendar year other than the one in which it was awarded. (Sec. 5) The bill establishes the HIRE Vets Medallion Award Fund. Labor may assess a reasonable medallion application fee and shall deposit such fees into the fund. (Sec. 6) Beginning two years after enactment of this bill, Labor shall submit annual reports on fees, program costs, the number of applications, and the medallions awarded, including the name and medallion level of each recipient. (Sec. 7) The bill excludes from the definition of "employer" the federal government, any state, or any foreign state. (Sec. 8) The Veterans Access Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 is amended to cap FY2016 bonuses at $2 million for senior executive service employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
HIRE Vets Act Honoring Investments in Recruiting and Employing American Military Veterans Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Gwen Graham [D-FL] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6340-6341) |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3286. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6340-6343) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 547. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-708. |
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-07-29 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1167) |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2263 (Related) 2015-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employee hiring
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Employee hiring
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition