US HB3284 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Counterterrorism Awareness Workshop Series Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act to direct the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to establish a Joint Counterterrorism Awareness Workshop Series to address emerging terrorist threats and to enhance the ability of state and local jurisdictions to prevent, protect against, respond to, and recover from terrorist attacks. The workshop series shall include: reviewing terrorism preparedness, response, and interdiction plans, policies, and procedures of the participating jurisdictions and identifying gaps in such plans, operational capabilities, response resources, and authorities; identifying federal, state, and local resources available to address such gaps; providing assistance to build or sustain the capabilities to close such gaps; examining the roles and responsibilities of participating agencies and respective communities in the event of a terrorist attack; improving situational awareness and information sharing among all participating agencies in the event of such an attack; and identifying and sharing best practices and lessons learned from each workshop series. FEMA shall select jurisdictions to host a workshop series from cities that have received or are receiving funding under the Urban Area Security Initiative and have requested to be considered. Individuals from state and local jurisdictions and emergency response providers in cities selected shall be eligible to participate in the series. FEMA must report, each year for the next six years, to all participating agencies and to Congress regarding key findings or themes, lessons learned, and best practices identified.
Title
Joint Counterterrorism Awareness Workshop Series Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 529 (Y: 398 N: 4 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 4 (Roll no. 529). (text: 09/12/17 CR H7229-7230) |
2017-09-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7411-7412) |
2017-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3284. |
2017-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7229-7232) |
2017-09-12 | House | Mr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 204. |
2017-09-01 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-284. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Crime prevention
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development