US HB3275 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-231. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-231. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 340 Wetmore Avenue in Grand River, Ohio, as the "Lance Corporal Andy 'Ace' Nowacki Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 340 Wetmore Avenue in Grand River, Ohio, as the "Lance Corporal Andy 'Ace' Nowacki Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-231. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4365) |
2020-09-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3275. |
2020-09-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4365-4366) |
2020-09-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Ohio
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Ohio
Postal service