US HB3269 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to list fentanyl-related substances as schedule I controlled substances, and for other purposes.
Title
Federal Initiative to Guarantee Health by Targeting Fentanyl Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1910 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB339 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
SB339 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3269/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3269/BILLS-117hr3269ih.pdf |