US HB3258 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6046)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6046)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marketplace Certainty Act
Title
Marketplace Certainty Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6046) |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1462 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1511 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3748 (Related) 2017-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2708 (Related) 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2265-2266)
SB1511 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3748 (Related) 2017-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2708 (Related) 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2265-2266)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3258/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3258/BILLS-115hr3258ih.pdf |