US HB3256 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS) Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards (CFATS) program until May 1, 2025. The CFATS program requires chemical facilities to assess and address their threat vulnerabilities. The bill requires DHS to (1) verify information submitted by a covered chemical facility prior to assigning such facility a lower risk tier or determining that such facility no longer presents a high level of security risk, and (2) develop a voluntary program for chemical facilities to address potential security risks. DHS shall, among other things (1) provide for an annual review of a facility's compliance with its emergency response plan; (2) make available to state, local, and regional fusion centers and state and local government officials such information as it deems necessary to ensure that emergency response providers are prepared and provided with the situational awareness needed to respond to security incidents; and (3) establish a Chemical Security Advisory Committee to advise DHS on the implementation of this bill. The Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency shall (1) conduct a review of potential effects of attacks on covered chemical facilities or other critical infrastructure; and (2) establish a secure communications and information technology infrastructure or platform that allows facility owners and operators to voluntarily report on emerging threats, including terrorism threats posed by unmanned aircraft systems (i.e., drones) to covered chemical facilities. The Government Accountability Office shall evaluate the effectiveness of DHS risk-based performance standards.
Title
Protecting and Securing Chemical Facilities from Terrorist Attacks Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427. |
2020-09-21 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2019-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-341, Part I. |
2019-06-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 12. |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-19 | House | Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment discrimination and employee rights
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment discrimination and employee rights
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Terrorism