US HB3253 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 116-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Empowering Beneficiaries, Ensuring Access, and Strengthening Accountability Act of 2019 This bill alters several Medicaid programs and funding mechanisms. Specifically, the bill makes appropriations through FY2024 for, and otherwise revises, the Money Follows the Person Rebalancing Demonstration Program; allows state Medicaid fraud control units to review complaints regarding patients who are in noninstitutional or other settings; temporarily extends the applicability of Medicaid eligibility criteria that protect against spousal impoverishment for recipients of home and community-based services; temporarily extends the Medicaid demonstration program for certified community behavioral health clinics; repeals the requirement, under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program, that drug manufacturers include the prices of certain authorized generic drugs when determining the average manufacturer price (AMP) of brand name drugs (also known as a "blended AMP"), and excludes manufacturers from the definition of "wholesalers" for purposes of rebate calculations; and increases funding available to the Medicaid Improvement Fund beginning in FY2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering Beneficiaries, Ensuring Access, and Strengthening Accountability Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 333 (Y: 371 N: 46 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-06SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-39.
2019-08-06SenateSigned by President.
2019-08-01SenatePresented to President.
2019-07-30SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-30SenateOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7477-7478)
2019-07-30SenateMs. Norton asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7477-7478)
2019-07-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-25SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5114)
2019-07-25SenateS.Amdt.930 Amendment SA 930 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-25SenateS.Amdt.930 Amendment SA 930 proposed by Senator Scott FL for Senator Blunt. (consideration: CR S5114; text: CR S5114) In the nature of a substitute.
2019-07-25SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
2019-06-19SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-06-18HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-18HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 46 (Roll no. 333). (text: CR H4706-4707)
2019-06-18HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4751)
2019-06-18HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-06-18HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3253.
2019-06-18HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4706-4710)
2019-06-18HouseMrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB233 (Similar To) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1342 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB548 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3276 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback