US HB3250 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-8)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-8)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to study the sites associated with the life and legacy of Julius Rosenwald, a part owner and President of Sears, Roebuck and Company and a noted philanthropist who helped finance construction of 5,357 schools in 15 southern states between 1912 and 1932. The study shall include a special emphasis on specified sites, including certain Rosenwald Schools. In conducting such study, Interior shall (1) evaluate the national significance of the sites; and (2) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the sites as a unit of the National Park System, including an interpretive center in or near Chicago, Illinois.
Title
Julius Rosenwald and the Rosenwald Schools Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 387 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-336. |
2021-01-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-01-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7902) |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 5 (Roll no. 245). (text: CR H7247) |
2020-12-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7252-7253) |
2020-12-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-12-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3250. |
2020-12-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7247-7248) |
2020-12-17 | House | Mr. Gallego moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345. |
2020-06-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-431. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1863 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Educational facilities and institutions
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Educational facilities and institutions
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations