US HB3248 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VET Act of 2015 Veterans Entrepreneurial Transition Act of 2015 This bill amends the Small Business Act to direct the Small Business Administration to carry out a pilot program to assess the feasibility and advisability of making grants to eligible veterans to start or acquire a qualifying business enterprise.
Title
VET Act of 2015 Veterans Entrepreneurial Transition Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2015-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1862 (Related) 2015-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1870 (Same As) 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-411.
SB1870 (Same As) 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-411.
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Retail and wholesale trades
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Commerce
Retail and wholesale trades
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3248/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3248/BILLS-114hr3248ih.pdf |