US HB3247 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect United States Security in the Arctic Act of 2017 This bill instructs the President to submit to Congress a strategy to protect U.S. interests in the Arctic region. Such strategy shall include goals to: improve telecommunications, navigation, ocean and coastal mapping, and Coast Guard and other infrastructure to support a sustained security and emergency response presence for Alaska; direct the U.S. representative to the Arctic Council to use the voice and vote of the United States to conduct increased confidence-building and cooperative security measures with other member countries; support climate resilience efforts across the Arctic region; and sustain robust research funding to understand the ongoing climate changes in the Arctic region and their global impact. The Government Accountability Office (GAO) shall submit a report that assesses the cost and procurement schedule for new U.S. icebreakers. Consistent with the recapitalization plan for the acquisition of heavy and medium icebreakers to meet Coast Guard statutory missions in the polar regions, the department in which the Coast Guard is operating: (1) may enter into a contract to procure up to three Coast Guard heavy icebreakers for the defense of U.S. interests in the Arctic region, beginning In FY2018; and (2) shall report on its plans to procure and sustain icebreakers in addition to the vessels authorized to be procured under such contract and to ensure that at least three Coast Guard icebreakers are ready for operations at all times.
Title
Protect United States Security in the Arctic Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Alaska
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency communications systems
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Alaska
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency communications systems
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3247/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3247/BILLS-115hr3247ih.pdf |