US HB3245 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Efficient Service for Veterans Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) and the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to jointly ensure that certain VA readjustment counseling centers have access to the Defense Personnel Record Image Retrieval and the VA/DOD Identity Repository Systems.
Title
Efficient Service for Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Ann Buerkle [R-NY] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-12-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Government information and archives
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3245/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3245/BILLS-112hr3245ih.pdf |