US HB3245 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fairness in Cocaine Sentencing Act of 2009 - Repeals provisions of the Controlled Substances Act that provide different criminal penalties for the manufacturing, distributing, or dispensing of cocaine and cocaine base (i.e., crack cocaine), including the mandatory minimum five-year prison sentence for simple possessesion of cocaine base. Repeals provisions of the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act that provide different criminal penalties for the importing and exporting of cocaine and cocaine base.
Title
Fairness in Cocaine Sentencing Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-01 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 400. | |
2010-12-01 | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. | |
2010-12-01 | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-670, Part I. | |
2009-07-29 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-07-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-23 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-07-23 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection. | |
2009-07-16 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-07-16 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-07-16 | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1459 (Related) 2009-05-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Smuggling and trafficking
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Smuggling and trafficking