US HB3230 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To combat the spread of disinformation through restrictions on deep-fake video alteration technology.
Title
DEEP FAKES Accountability Act Defending Each and Every Person from False Appearances by Keeping Exploitation Subject to Accountability Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
China
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Digital media
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Photography and imaging
Public-private cooperation
Right of privacy
Russia
Sound recording
Subversive activities
China
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Digital media
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Photography and imaging
Public-private cooperation
Right of privacy
Russia
Sound recording
Subversive activities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3230/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3230/BILLS-116hr3230ih.pdf |