US HB3228 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to improve science, data, and services that enable sound decision making in response to coastal flood risk, including impacts of sea level rise, storm events, changing Great Lakes water levels, and land subsidence.
Title
National Coastal Resilience Data and Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 413. |
2022-11-16 | House | Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-572, Part I. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2021-06-22 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |