US HB3225 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restoring Community Input and Public Protections in Oil and Gas Leasing Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restoring Community Input and Public Protections in Oil and Gas Leasing Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-06-20HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-06-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-12HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback