US HB3225 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Oregon Tribal Economic Development Act (Sec. 2) This bill allows the Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua, and Siuslaw Indians, the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes of Siletz Indians of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes of Warm Springs, and the Cow Creek Band of Umpqua Tribe of Indians to lease, sell, convey, warrant, or transfer their real property that is not held in trust by the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oregon Tribal Economic Development Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 425.
2018-02-15HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-564.
2018-01-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-01-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2017-11-15HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-07-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-07-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-07-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1285 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-179.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback