US HB3224 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to extend the authorization of the Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Office of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Extension Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 707 (Y: 394 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 707). (text: CR H6759) |
2023-12-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6800-6801) |
2023-12-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3224. |
2023-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6759-6760) |
2023-12-11 | House | Mr. D'Esposito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-07-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 126. |
2023-07-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-159. |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2023-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |