US HB3218 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize certain water pollution control programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Wastewater Infrastructure Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB1881 (Related) 2021-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB1881 (Related) 2021-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3218/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3218/BILLS-117hr3218ih.pdf |