US HB3212 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - Referred for a period ending not later than October 19, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - Referred for a period ending not later than October 19, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CAH Designation Waiver Authority Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act with respect to the Medicare rural hospital flexibility program and the "35-mile requirement" for designation of a critical access hospital (CAH) that a facility be located in a rural area more than 35 miles (or 15 miles in mountainous terrain or where only secondary roads are available) from another CAH. (A CAH is a hospital certified to receive cost-based reimbursement from Medicare.) Prohibits a state from designating a facility as a CAH unless: (1) it was assigned a Medicare provider number as an acute inpatient hospital before enactment of this Act, and (2) the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) determines that such designation would not result in the total number of facilities so designated in all states on or after enactment of this Act being greater than 10% of the total number of acute inpatient hospitals designated as CAHs in all states as of March 31, 2011.
Title
CAH Designation Waiver Authority Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-19 | House | Referred for a period ending not later than October 19, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned. |
2011-10-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3212/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3212/BILLS-112hr3212ih.pdf |