US HB3209 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 114-184. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 114-184. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recovering Missing Children Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to permit federal law enforcement officials to seek an ex parte order in federal court for the disclosure of tax returns or return information for criminal investigations pertaining to missing or exploited children. If the order is granted, the information may be disclosed to federal officers and employees who are personally and directly engaged in judicial or administrative proceedings, investigations, or federal grand jury proceedings to enforce a federal criminal statute pertaining to a missing or exploited child. A federal agency may disclose to state and local law enforcement agencies information obtained under the authority provided by this bill if: the state or local agency is part of a team with the federal agency in the investigation, and the information is disclosed only to officers and employees who are personally and directly engaged in the investigation. The state or local agency may only use the disclosed information in locating the missing child, in a grand jury proceeding, or in any preparation for, or investigation which may result in, a judicial or administrative proceeding.
Title
Recovering Missing Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-184. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4287-4288) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2189) |
2016-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3209. |
2016-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2189-2192) |
2016-05-10 | House | Mr. Paulsen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 418. |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-542. |
2016-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5520) |
2015-07-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3016 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation