US HB3203 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To impose sanctions with respect to Chinese producers of synthetic opioids and opioid precursors, to hold Chinese officials accountable for the spread of illicit fentanyl, and for other purposes.
Title
Stop Chinese Fentanyl Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] |
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2023-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3910-3911) |
2023-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3203. |
2023-07-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3910-3913) |
2023-07-25 | House | Mr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Accountability, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |