US HB3193 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the United States courthouse under construction at 101 South United States Route 1 in Fort Pierce, Florida, as the "Alto Lee Adams, Sr., United States Courthouse."
Title
To designate the United States courthouse under construction at 101 South United States Route 1 in Fort Pierce, Florida, as the "Alto Lee Adams, Sr., United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ron Klein [D-FL] |
Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Adam Putnam [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. | |
2009-09-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9370) | |
2009-09-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3193. | |
2009-09-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9370-9371) | |
2009-09-09 | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-09-08 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 104. | |
2009-09-08 | Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-245. | |
2009-07-30 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-07-30 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-30 | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. | |
2009-07-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2009-07-13 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics