US HB3190 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-14)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

BURMA Act of 2019 Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2019 This act imposes sanctions, authorizes assistance, and requires the establishment of various programs and strategies related to Burma (Myanmar). The President shall impose sanctions against current or former officials who are responsible for or who supported serious human rights abuses in Burma, as well as against entities controlled by such officials and military-linked entities that provide such officials significant financial benefits. The sanctions shall include asset blocking and visa blocking. The bill authorizes humanitarian aid for Burma, Bangladesh, and the surrounding region for various purposes, including aid for ethnic minorities targeted by Burma's military and support for voluntary resettlement of displaced persons. The Department of State shall maintain a publicly available website listing entities in Burma's gemstone sector that meet certain transparency and due-diligence requirements related to ownership, control, and supply-chain standards. The State Department shall also issue guidance for U.S. companies as to best practices for supply-chain due diligence when dealing with Burmese gemstone entities. The State Department shall report to Congress on topics including (1) accountability for war crimes in Burma, and (2) a strategy for promoting economic development in Burma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BURMA Act of 2019 Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-24 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 541 (Y: 394 N: 21 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-09-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 21 (Roll no. 541). (text: CR H7878-7883)
2019-09-24HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7888-7889)
2019-09-24HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-09-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3190.
2019-09-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7878-7885)
2019-09-24HouseMr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects

Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Bangladesh
Burma
Business ethics
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military personnel and dependents
Mining
News media and reporting
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sex offenses
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Thailand
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback