US HB3182 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 52-17)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Securities and Exchange Commission and federal financial regulators to report on the implementation of the Current Expected Credit Losses (CECL) accounting standard and its impact on credit availability, capital requirements, financial institutions, and nonfinancial institutions. Required compliance with the CECL standard is delayed until one year after submission of this report.
Title
CECL Consumer Impact and Study Bill of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1564 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Economic performance and conditions
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Small business
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Economic performance and conditions
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3182/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3182/BILLS-116hr3182ih.pdf |