US HB3157 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Working Families Tax Relief Act of 2019 This bill increases and revises requirements for the refundable earned income and child tax credits. It also makes similar revisions to the earned income tax credit for residents of Puerto Rico. The bill authorizes the Department of the Treasury to regulate the practice of tax return preparers and impose sanctions upon preparers found to be incompetent or disreputable. The Government Accountability Office must study and report on the sharing of information between Treasury and states regarding identification numbers issued to tax return preparers and minimum standards for preparers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Working Families Tax Relief Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3330 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1138 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1192 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback