US HB3130 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Operation Stonegarden grant program, and for other purposes.
Title
Operation Stonegarden Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1709 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4828 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB6637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4828 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB6637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3130/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3130/BILLS-117hr3130ih.pdf |