US HB3128 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 9 .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 9 .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 111 of the Clean Air Act to clarify when a physical change in, or change in the method of operation of, a stationary source constitutes a modification, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Clean Air Act to provide that a modification of a stationary source results in an increase in air pollution only when the maximum achievable hourly emissions rate from the source is higher than: (1) the rate of the source as it was originally designed, and (2) the rate that was actually achieved during the 10 years before the change.
Title
To amend section 111 of the Clean Air Act to clarify when a physical change in, or change in the method of operation of, a stationary source constitutes a modification, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 9 . |
2018-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2761 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3128/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3128/BILLS-115hr3128ih.pdf |