US HB312 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act This bill reaffirms the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe reservation as trust land in Massachusetts. In addition, the bill requires actions, including actions pending in federal court, relating to the land to be dismissed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - On passage RC# 207 (Y: 275 N: 146 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-05-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-15HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 275 - 146 (Roll no. 207). (text: CR H3817)
2019-05-15HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-05-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 312.
2019-05-15HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5, H.R. 312 and H.R. 987. The resolution provides for 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 5, under a closed rule. Section 2 of the resolution provides for 60 minutes of debate on H.R. 312, under a closed rule and section 3 provides 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 987, under a structured rule.
2019-05-15HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 377. (consideration: CR H3816-3824)
2019-05-14HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 377 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5, H.R. 312 and H.R. 987. The resolution provides for 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 5, under a closed rule. Section 2 of the resolution provides for 60 minutes of debate on H.R. 312, under a closed rule and section 3 provides 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 987, under a structured rule.
2019-05-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
2019-05-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-54.
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 10.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
2019-04-03HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR377 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback