US HB3115 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Superior National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2017 (Sec. 4) This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to convey specified National Forest System land within the Superior National Forest in St. Louis County, Minnesota, to Poly Met Mining Corporation, Inc., in exchange for specified nonfederal lands within the forest in St. Louis and Lake Counties, Minnesota. Poly Met shall pay or reimburse all land survey, appraisal, land title, deed preparation, and other costs incurred by USDA in completing such exchange. All of the funds paid or reimbursed to USDA must be deposited into accounts and used for the purposes specified in certain collection agreements pertaining to such exchange. The United States shall reserve the mineral rights on a specified portion of the federal land exchanged. As set forth in the Final Record of Decision of January 9, 2017, approving such exchange, Poly Met shall honor existing road and transmission line authorizations on the federal land exchanged. (Sec. 5) The appraised values of the federal and nonfederal lands that were determined and approved by USDA in November 2015 shall be the values used to complete the exchange and shall not be subject to reappraisal. Poly Met shall waive any payment otherwise owed to it by the United States to equalize the values of the exchanged lands. Such waiver shall be considered as a voluntary donation to the United States by Poly Met for all purposes of law. (Sec. 7) Upon conveyance, the non-federal lands shall become part of the Superior National Forest and shall be managed in accordance with the Weeks Law and in a manner consistent with the land and resource management plan applicable to adjacent federally owned lands in the forest. Upon conveyance, the federal land shall: (1) become private land and shall be made available for any lawful use in accordance with applicable federal, state, and local laws and regulations that pertain to mining and other uses of land in private ownership; and (2) be withdrawn from appropriation and disposal under public land laws and under laws relating to mineral and geothermal leasing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superior National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 639 (Y: 309 N: 99 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
2017-11-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 309 - 99 (Roll no. 639). (text: CR H9445-9446)
2017-11-28HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9455)
2017-11-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-11-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3115.
2017-11-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9445-9448)
2017-11-28HouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-05HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 206.
2017-09-05HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-287.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 10.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-07-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2017-07-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-06-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-06-29HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback