US HB3114 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Became Public Law No: 114-189. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Became Public Law No: 114-189. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funds to the Army Corps of Engineers to hire veterans and members of the Armed Forces to assist the Corps with curation and historic preservation activities, and for other purposes. (Sec. 2) Directs the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, using available funds, to develop a Veterans' Curation Program to hire veterans and members of the Armed Forces to assist in carrying out curation and historic preservation activities.
Title
To provide funds to the Army Corps of Engineers to hire veterans and members of the Armed Forces to assist the Corps with curation and historic preservation activities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 422 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-189. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4560) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 472. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2015-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 3 (Roll no. 632). (text: CR 11/16/2015 H8169) |
2015-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8260) |
2015-11-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3114. |
2015-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8169-8170) |
2015-11-16 | House | Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188. |
2015-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-249. |
2015-07-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-07-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-23 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2015-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Archaeology and anthropology
Army Corps of Engineers
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Historical and cultural resources
Infrastructure development
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation and public works
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Army Corps of Engineers
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Historical and cultural resources
Infrastructure development
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation and public works
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation