US HB31 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-21)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Hearing: May 22 @ 2:00 pm in S-116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Caesar Syria Civilian Protection Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caesar Syria Civilian Protection Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-01-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H970-971)
2019-01-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 31.
2019-01-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H970-974)
2019-01-22HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Held at the desk.
SB52 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB336 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.

Subjects

Arms control and nonproliferation
Aviation and airports
Chemical and biological weapons
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback