US HB3093 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies processes for the acquisition of software for the Department of Defense (DOD). It requires DOD to establish guidance for the use of pathways for the rapid acquisition of software applications and upgrades that are intended to be fielded within one year: An applications pathway shall provide for the use of rapid development and implementation of applications to be used with commercially available hardware. An upgrades pathway shall provide for the rapid development and insertion of software upgrades for hardware systems solely used by DOD. The bill requires DOD to establish software development and acquisition training and management programs enabling software personnel to earn a certification in software development and acquisition.
Title
CODER Act of 2019 Creating Opportunities through Defense Engineering Requirements Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3093/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3093/BILLS-116hr3093ih.pdf |