US HB3085 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2588)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Combat-Injured Veterans Tax Fairness Act of 2016 to apply to members of the Coast Guard when the Coast Guard is not operating as a service in the Department of the Navy, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coast Guard Combat-Injured Tax Fairness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2588)
2023-05-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2023-05-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-05-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB725 (Same As) 2023-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback